Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célio da Silveira Calixto Filho

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Segia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1973 Born
8 Dec 200128.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Sep 200229.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 May 202047.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 May 202047.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
22 Aug 202047.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia

MicroData Summary for Célio da Silveira Calixto Filho
Bishop Célio da Silveira Calixto Filho (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePassos, Diocese of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais
Ordained DeaconSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2020
  • ob/c02: CB, 27 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 27 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Aug 2020

Quantcast