Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Barra do Piraí | |||
4 December 1922 | Erected | Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) | Diocese of Barra do Piraí (erected)
Diocese of Campos (erected) |
27 March 1925 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra do Piraí | Diocese of Valença (erected) |
13 April 1946 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra do Piraí (S. Joâo de Nerity and Gaxias)
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (Sâo Pedro d'Alcantara do Petropolis, S. Antonio do Alto da Serra, San Norberto, Cascatinha, Itaipava, Sào José do Rio Preto, S. Antonio do Alto da Serra de Sebastiana, Nossa Senhora da Piedade di Mage, S. Nicolau da Surui, Irihomirim, Gapimirim, Nossa...) | Diocese of Petrópolis (erected) |
26 March 1960 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra do Piraí (Nova Iguacú, Nilópolis, Itaguaí, Mangaratiba, district of Tairetá, and region Sertâo (Vassouras))
Diocese of Petrópolis (Our Lady of Graces, from St. John the Baptist and from St. Matthew in the city of St. John of Merit) | Diocese of Nova Iguaçu (erected) |
13 June 1960 | Territory Added | Diocese of Valença (Ipiabas) | Diocese of Barra do Piraí |
Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda | |||
26 January 1965 | Name Changed | Diocese of Barra do Piraí | Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda |
14 March 1980 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda (Angra dos Reis and Parati)
Diocese of Nova Iguaçu (Itaguai and Mangaratiba) | Diocese of Itaguaí (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Barra do Piraí | ||||||||||||
1950 | 350,000 | 400,000 | 87.5% | 31 | 19 | 50 | 7,000 | 20 | 71 | 34 | ap1951 | |
1959 | 650,000 | 800,000 | 81.3% | 40 | 65 | 105 | 6,190 | 90 | 135 | 49 | ap1960 | |
Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda | ||||||||||||
1966 | 600,000 | 600,000 | 100.0% | 23 | 31 | 54 | 11,111 | 35 | 62 | 32 | ap1967 | |
1970 | 300,000 | 500,000 | 60.0% | 23 | 32 | 55 | 5,454 | 43 | 95 | 42 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 337,000 | 524,000 | 64.3% | 20 | 28 | 48 | 7,020 | 3 | 34 | 153 | 26 | ap1977 |
1980 | 375,000 | 608,060 | 61.7% | 22 | 30 | 52 | 7,211 | 4 | 49 | 92 | 26 | ap1981 |
1990 | 688,224 | 770,708 | 89.3% | 27 | 21 | 48 | 14,338 | 3 | 51 | 112 | 26 | ap1991 |
1999 | 592,605 | 790,140 | 75.0% | 28 | 15 | 43 | 13,781 | 2 | 25 | 101 | 20 | ap2000 |
2000 | 563,507 | 751,343 | 75.0% | 28 | 19 | 47 | 11,989 | 2 | 29 | 95 | 22 | ap2001 |
2001 | 556,525 | 742,034 | 75.0% | 26 | 19 | 45 | 12,367 | 2 | 28 | 101 | 22 | ap2002 |
2002 | 556,525 | 742,034 | 75.0% | 26 | 17 | 43 | 12,942 | 2 | 18 | 99 | 22 | ap2003 |
2003 | 556,525 | 742,034 | 75.0% | 27 | 16 | 43 | 12,942 | 2 | 19 | 94 | 22 | ap2004 |
2004 | 556,525 | 742,034 | 75.0% | 28 | 15 | 43 | 12,942 | 3 | 18 | 84 | 22 | ap2005 |
2006 | 572,000 | 761,000 | 75.2% | 31 | 17 | 48 | 11,916 | 3 | 21 | 74 | 22 | ap2007 |
2012 | 683,000 | 813,000 | 84.0% | 40 | 16 | 56 | 12,196 | 15 | 16 | 67 | 22 | ap2013 |
2015 | 700,000 | 832,000 | 84.1% | 45 | 17 | 62 | 11,290 | 19 | 18 | 47 | 28 | ap2016 |
2018 | 606,000 | 824,560 | 73.5% | 47 | 14 | 61 | 9,934 | 20 | 15 | 47 | 28 | ap2019 |
2020 | 615,800 | 837,600 | 73.5% | 48 | 13 | 61 | 10,095 | 19 | 16 | 47 | 28 | ap2021 |
2022 | 625,000 | 850,000 | 73.5% | 50 | 13 | 63 | 9,920 | 18 | 14 | 31 | 29 | ap2023 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Feb 2024 |
✠