Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Pereira da Silva Barros

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Archbishop of Darnis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1835BornTaubaté
13 Sep 185721.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Dec 185823.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 188145.3SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
13 May 188145.5ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
28 Aug 188145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
12 May 189155.5AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Apr 189256.4AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
1 Sep 189357.8ResignedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
2 Dec 189560.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
15 Apr 189862.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Pereira da Silva Barros:
Archbishop José Pereira da Silva Barros (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 240, and Page 424
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013