Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilson Andrade da Silva

Coadjutor Bishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1966 Born
4 Aug 199124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Jul 201144.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
27 Jul 201144.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Noba
24 Sep 201145.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Noba
27 Jun 201851.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gilson Andrade da Silva
Bishop Gilson Andrade da Silva (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Nova Iguaçu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Pedro de Alcântara, Cathedral, Petrópolis, Diocese of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nova Iguaçu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 27 Jul 2011
  • c2+: CB, 24 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast