Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Batista da Mota e Albuquerque

Deceased

Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1909BornNiterói
25 Apr 193323.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Apr 195747.6AppointedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
25 Jul 195747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
26 May 195848.7AppointedArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
27 Apr 198474.6DiedArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Batista da Mota e Albuquerque:
Archbishop João Batista da Mota e Albuquerque (born , died ) Archbishop of Vitória

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015