Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim Silvério de Souza

Deceased

Archbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1859BornSão Miguel de Piracicaba
24 Feb 188222.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mariana, Brazil
4 Mar 188222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Brazil
16 Nov 190142.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Diamantina, Brazil
16 Nov 190142.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
2 Feb 190242.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
17 May 190545.8SucceededBishop of Diamantina, Brazil
29 Jan 190949.5ResignedBishop of Diamantina, Brazil
29 Jan 190949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Jan 190949.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Axomis
25 Jan 191050.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Diamantina, Brazil
28 Jun 191757.9AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Aug 193374.1DiedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Silvério de Souza:
Archbishop Joaquim Silvério de Souza (born , died ) Archbishop of Diamantina

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35, and Page 76
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013