Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romeu Brigenti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Illici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1916BornJuiz de Fora
8 Dec 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 197962.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
2 Aug 197962.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Illici
12 Oct 197963.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illici
14 Nov 200185.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Mar 200891.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Romeu Brigenti:
Bishop Romeu Brigenti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Mar 2014