Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honorato Piazera, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lages, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1911BornJaraguá do Sul
30 Nov 193625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
11 Jul 195947.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jul 195947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Termessus
11 Oct 195947.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termessus
14 Dec 196150.1AppointedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Feb 196654.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
12 Feb 196654.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Iabar
17 Nov 197362.0SucceededBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Feb 198775.3RetiredBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
23 Oct 199078.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Honorato Piazera:
Bishop Honorato Piazera S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lages

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013