Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Teixeira Gurgel, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1921BornIguatú
29 Jun 194422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
20 Feb 196745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Feb 196745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
14 May 196745.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta
26 Apr 197149.5AppointedBishop of Itabira, Brazil
15 May 199674.6RetiredBishop of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Sep 200684.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Itabira-Fabriciano, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Teixeira Gurgel:
Bishop Mário Teixeira Gurgel S.D.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Itabira-Fabriciano

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Jun 2014