Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Santa Mariana e Souza, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1782BornPernambuco
7 Feb 179916.1ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
1 Mar 184158.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
1 Mar 184158.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
13 Jun 184158.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
6 May 186481.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Santa Mariana e Souza:
Bishop Pedro de Santa Mariana e Souza O.C.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013