Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquim Justiniano Mascarenhas Castello Branco

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1731BornRio de Janeiro
13 Oct 175423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Oct 175423.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 177342.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Dec 177342.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Dec 177342.3SucceededBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Dec 177342.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
30 Jan 177442.4Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Jan 180573.4DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Joaquim Justiniano Mascarenhas Castello Branco:
Bishop José Joaquim Justiniano Mascarenhas Castello Branco (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 371, and Page 408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013