Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Vicente Távora

Deceased

Archbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1910Born
8 May 193423.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 195443.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
23 Jun 195443.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
25 Jul 195444.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
20 Nov 195747.3AppointedBishop of Aracajú, Brazil
30 Apr 196049.7AppointedArchbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
3 Apr 197059.7DiedArchbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Távora
Archbishop José Vicente Távora (born , died ) Archbishop of Aracajú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrobó

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 1 Jun 2018

Quantcast