Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dario Edoardo Viganò

Prefect Emeritus of the Secretariat for Communications

Priest of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1962 Born
13 Jun 198724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Jun 201553.0AppointedPrefect of the Secretariat for Communications
21 Mar 201855.7ResignedPrefect of the Secretariat for Communications

MicroData Summary for Dario Edoardo Viganò (VIAF: 29643938)
Father Dario Edoardo Viganò (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Communications

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Secretariat for Communications.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Vicariatus Urbis, 16 May 2016
  • loc: AM, 12 Mar 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast