Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René de Pontes

Deceased

Bishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1902Born
24 Aug 192826.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 193836.2AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Nov 193836.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
2 Apr 194037.6DiedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for René de Pontes
Bishop René de Pontes (born , died ) Bishop of Valença

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 11.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast