Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente da Gamal Leao

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1713BornEspinhal
7 Jan 174127.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jan 174127.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 175642.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Jul 175642.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
24 Oct 175643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
11 Dec 177360.2ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
1 Oct 1791³78.0DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Vicente da Gamal Leao:
Bishop Vicente da Gamal Leao (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234, and Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015