Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Othon Motta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campanha, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1913BornRio de Janeiro
12 Jan 193622.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Mar 195339.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
10 Mar 195339.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzita
24 May 195340.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzita
195541.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 May 195946.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 May 196047.0SucceededBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Jan 198268.7ResignedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Jan 198571.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Othon Motta:
Bishop Othon Motta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campanha

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 30 Nov 2013