Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul | |||
7 May 1848 | Erected | Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro | Diocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul (erected) |
15 August 1910 | Territory Lost | Diocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul | Diocese of Pelotas (erected)
Diocese of Santa Maria (erected) Diocese of Uruguaiana (erected) |
Archdiocese of Porto Alegre | |||
15 August 1910 | Elevated | Diocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre |
8 September 1934 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre | Diocese of Caxias (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Vacaria (erected) |
13 February 1937 | Territory Added | Diocese of Santa Maria (Rio Pardo and Candelaria) | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre |
27 April 1959 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (Mussum and Santa Lucia do Piai (of Caxias do Sul)) | Diocese of Caxias |
27 April 1959 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (Guaporé and Casca along with Maria (of Marau)) | Diocese of Passo Fundo |
20 June 1959 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (Santa Cruz do Sul, Arroio do Meio, Candelaria, Encantado, Encruzilhada do Sul, Lajeado, Rio Pardo, Venancio Aires, Vera Cruz, and Arvorezinha) | Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul (erected) |
23 November 1970 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (S. Francis de Paula) | Diocese of Caxias do Sul |
2 February 1980 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (Canela, Campo Bom, Dois Irmâos, Estancia Velha, Gramado, Igrejinha, Ivoti, Nova Petrópolis, Nova Hamburg, Rolante, São Leopoldo, Sapiranga, Taquara, and Tres Coroas, along with Santo Antonio) | Diocese of Novo Hamburgo (erected) |
10 November 1999 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Caxias do Sul
Archdiocese of Porto Alegre | Diocese of Osório (erected) (Arroio do Sal, Balneario Pinhal, Capão da Canoa, Capivari do Sul, Caraá, Cidreira, Dom Pedro de Alcantara, Imbé, Itati, Mampituba, Maquiné, Morrinhos do Sul, Osório, Palmares do Sul, Santo Antonio da Patrulha, Terra de Areia, Torres, Tramandai, Tres ...) |
2 July 2008 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Porto Alegre (Montenegro, Alto Feliz, Barão, Bom Princípio, Bom Retiro do Sul, Brochier, Capela de Santana, Colinas, Estrela, Fazenda Vila Nova, Feliz, Harmonia, Linha Nova, Maratá, Pareci Novo, Paverama, Poço das Antas, Portão, Roca Sales, Salvador do Sul, São José...) | Diocese of Montenegro (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archdiocese of Porto Alegre | ||||||||||||
1950 | 950,000 | 1,210,000 | 78.5% | 179 | 232 | 411 | 2,311 | 869 | 1,499 | 137 | ap1951 | |
1965 | 1,260,000 | 1,562,490 | 80.6% | 233 | 251 | 484 | 2,603 | 874 | 2,539 | 157 | ap1967 | |
1970 | 1,850,000 | 2,309,730 | 80.1% | 238 | 286 | 524 | 3,530 | 6 | 721 | 2,548 | 174 | ap1971 |
1976 | 1,980,000 | 2,381,230 | 83.2% | 216 | 266 | 482 | 4,107 | 11 | 796 | 2,700 | 182 | ap1977 |
1980 | 2,202,000 | 2,648,000 | 83.2% | 224 | 281 | 505 | 4,360 | 19 | 735 | 2,303 | 186 | ap1981 |
1990 | 2,423,000 | 3,034,473 | 79.8% | 196 | 170 | 366 | 6,620 | 30 | 589 | 1,870 | 167 | ap1991 |
1999 | 2,608,707 | 3,265,577 | 79.9% | 224 | 263 | 487 | 5,356 | 21 | 534 | 1,650 | 160 | ap2000 |
2000 | 2,608,707 | 3,265,577 | 79.9% | 219 | 263 | 482 | 5,412 | 24 | 687 | 1,650 | 160 | ap2001 |
2001 | 2,972,749 | 3,304,054 | 90.0% | 247 | 280 | 527 | 5,640 | 21 | 720 | 1,828 | 167 | ap2002 |
2002 | 2,990,500 | 3,304,054 | 90.5% | 236 | 212 | 448 | 6,675 | 16 | 662 | 1,900 | 176 | ap2003 |
2003 | 2,475,398 | 3,306,657 | 74.9% | 234 | 194 | 428 | 5,783 | 22 | 570 | 1,317 | 179 | ap2004 |
2004 | 2,475,398 | 3,306,657 | 74.9% | 226 | 174 | 400 | 6,188 | 33 | 514 | 1,521 | 177 | ap2005 |
2013 | 2,527,000 | 3,395,000 | 74.4% | 207 | 155 | 362 | 6,980 | 58 | 369 | 1,118 | 156 | ap2014 |
2016 | 2,590,000 | 3,480,000 | 74.4% | 215 | 156 | 371 | 6,981 | 59 | 341 | 1,109 | 156 | ap2017 |
2019 | 2,148,100 | 3,378,000 | 63.6% | 206 | 135 | 341 | 6,299 | 58 | 313 | 1,032 | 160 | ap2020 |
2021 | 2,056,400 | 3,401,850 | 60.4% | 209 | 123 | 332 | 6,193 | 63 | 311 | 739 | 159 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Dec 2023 |
✠