Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roque Costa Souza

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Castellum Medianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1966 Born
18 Jun 199427.8Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 May 201245.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 May 201245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
23 Jun 201245.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum

MicroData Summary for Roque Costa Souza
Bishop Roque Costa Souza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 23 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast