Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Cunha Cruz

Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1964 Born
4 Aug 199026.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201046.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 201046.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
5 Feb 201146.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
20 May 201550.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Nov 201551.4SucceededBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cunha Cruz
Bishop Pedro Cunha Cruz (born ) Bishop of Campanha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campanha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,942
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 10
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2015
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast