Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Henrique da Silva Brito

Bishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1967 Born
14 Dec 199124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Feb 201244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Feb 201244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
12 May 201244.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
13 Mar 201951.8AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 May 201951.9InstalledBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Henrique da Silva Brito
Bishop Luiz Henrique da Silva Brito (born ) Bishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Gonçalo, Archdiocese of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Feb 2012
  • ob/c1: CB, 29 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,433
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 18 Mar 2019

Quantcast