Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Schismatic Bishop Carlos Duarte Costa] †

Not in Union with the Holy See

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1888Born
1 Apr 191122.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
4 Jul 192435.9AppointedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
8 Dec 192436.3Ordained BishopBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
22 Sep 193749.1ResignedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
22 Sep 193749.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maura
2 Jul 194556.9RemovedTitular Bishop of Maura
26 Mar 196172.6Died

MicroData Summary for Carlos Duarte Costa (VIAF: 162184338)
Bishop Carlos Duarte Costa (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Death PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 19 Dec 2019

Quantcast