Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto José Zini Filho

Deceased

Bishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1932BornPoços de Caldas
29 Jun 195926.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 199461.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
13 Jul 199461.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
8 Sep 199461.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
22 Jan 200370.2AppointedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Mar 200370.3InstalledBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Nov 200674.0DiedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augusto José Zini Filho:
Bishop Augusto José Zini Filho (born , died ) Bishop of Limeira

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,478
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013