Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Guadalupe, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1672Born
24 Mar 170229.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
21 Feb 172552.4AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
13 May 172552.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
31 Aug 174067.9DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Guadalupe
Bishop Antônio de Guadalupe O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmarante, Portugal

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,725, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast