Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo Duarte e Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1852Born
19 Dec 187422.8Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
23 Jan 189138.9AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
8 Feb 189139.0Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
6 Nov 190755.7AppointedBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
14 Mar 192371.1ResignedBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
14 Mar 192371.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
16 Oct 192472.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Duarte e Silva (VIAF: 63494057)
Archbishop Eduardo Duarte e Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uberaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorianopolis
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 6
  • 2i13: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1924, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017