Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waldyr Calheiros Novaes (de Novais)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1923BornMarici
25 Jul 194825.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 196440.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
25 Feb 196440.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
1 May 196440.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia
20 Oct 196643.2AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
17 Nov 199976.3RetiredBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Nov 201390.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Waldyr Calheiros Novaes (de Novais):
Bishop Waldyr Calheiros Novaes (de Novais) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 30 Nov 2013