Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Martínez de Aldunate

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1731BornSantiago
26 Mar 180472.3AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
21 Oct 180472.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
181078.0SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
8 Apr 181179.3DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Martínez de Aldunate:
Bishop José Antonio Martínez de Aldunate (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013