Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Alberto Fariña Fariña

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Citharizum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1878BornSantiago de Chile
21 Dec 190123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
7 Sep 194667.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
7 Sep 194667.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citharizum
6 Oct 194667.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citharizum
30 Apr 197192.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Pio Alberto Fariña Fariña:
Bishop Pio Alberto Fariña Fariña (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013