Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Montes Solar

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1829Born
5 Jun 185223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
11 Jul 189263.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Jul 189263.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
1 Jan 189363.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
7 Mar 190070.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Jorge Montes Solar
Bishop Jorge Montes Solar (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIllapel
Ordained PriestCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Buried Place (Original)Cementerio Catolico, Cemetery, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 94
  • c1/loc: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017