Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Arequipa

Archidioecesis Arequipensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 May 1943
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 26,306 (10,160 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadoarequipa.org.pe/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Moral San Francisco 118, Arequipa, Peru
  • Telephone: (54)21.47.78
  • Fax: 24.27.21

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Arequipa
15 April 1577ErectedArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Arequipa (erected)
1880Territory LostDiocese of Arequipa Vicariate Apostolic of Tarapacá (erected)
20 December 1929Territory LostDiocese of Arequipa
Vicariate Apostolic of Tarapacá (suppressed)
Diocese of Iquique (erected)
Archdiocese of Arequipa
23 May 1943ElevatedDiocese of Arequipa Archdiocese of Arequipa
18 December 1944Territory LostArchdiocese of Arequipa Diocese of Tacna (erected)
21 November 1957Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Archdiocese of Arequipa
Territorial Prelature of Caravelí (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Arequipa
1949450,500450,500100.0%72781503,0031030051ap1951
1959280,000297,54294.1%59921511,85418318342ap1960
1966400,000420,00095.2%641111752,28528947941ap1967
1968427,500450,00095.0%52961482,88814145839ap1971
1976398,284419,24795.0%48611093,65311735052ap1977
1980513,000545,00094.1%45741194,31012926667ap1981
1990651,000940,00069.3%68851534,25415525757ap1991
1999771,660857,40090.0%821161983,89721329075ap2000
2000787,000874,50090.0%861131993,95419029972ap2001
2001802,791891,99090.0%861061924,18115129572ap2002
2002818,846909,82990.0%901001904,30918033272ap2003
2003835,223928,02590.0%91971884,44217130472ap2004
2004835,223928,02590.0%88951834,56417130471ap2005
2006857,000952,00090.0%761011774,84116926274ap2007
20121,045,5551,163,13189.9%96871835,71318132073ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Aug 2014