Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Castro Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of San Felipe, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1902Born
22 Dec 192321.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 May 196360.9AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
14 Jul 196361.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Felipe, Chile
21 Jul 196361.1InstalledBishop of San Felipe, Chile
26 Jan 196562.6DiedBishop of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for José Luis Castro Cabrera
Bishop José Luis Castro Cabrera (born , died ) Bishop of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValparaiso

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast