Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristián Enrique Contreras Molina, O. de M.

Bishop of San Felipe, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1946 Born
14 Mar 196518.3EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
15 Mar 196619.3Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
21 Sep 197326.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
12 Oct 197427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
11 Jun 199245.5AppointedPrelate of Calama, Chile
5 Jul 199245.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Calama, Chile
19 Jul 199245.6InstalledPrelate of Calama, Chile
19 Jul 200255.6AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for Cristián Enrique Contreras Molina
Bishop Cristián Enrique Contreras Molina O. de M. (born ) Bishop of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Felipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,785
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/i: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017