Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio Francisco Ducasse Medina

Archbishop of Antofagasta, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1956 Born
24 Mar 198427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
31 May 200245.5AppointedBishop of Valdivia, Chile
13 Jul 200245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valdivia, Chile
8 Jun 201760.5AppointedArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Francisco Ducasse Medina
Archbishop Ignacio Francisco Ducasse Medina (born ) Archbishop of Antofagasta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antofagasta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,224
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017