Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Jara Marquez, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile

Titular Bishop of Archelaïs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1880Born
1897²16.5EnteredMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Apr 190524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jan 192645.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile
29 Jan 192645.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
29 Jun 192646.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
1938²57.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile
10 Feb 193958.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arturo Jara Marquez
Bishop Arturo Jara Marquez S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLontué
Buried Place (Original)Shrine of la Gratitud Nacional
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Punta Arenas, Diocese of Punta Arenas

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 40
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017