Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel de Sarricolea y Olea

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1670BornHuánuco, Peru
19 Sep 172352.8SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Nov 172353.0ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Oct 172453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
24 Jul 173059.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
5 May 173463.4AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
2 Oct 174069.8DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Manuel de Sarricolea y Olea:
Bishop José Manuel de Sarricolea y Olea (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013