Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raul Silva Silva

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rancagua

Titular Bishop of Eudoxias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1911BornSantiago del Chile
22 Sep 193423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Nov 196352.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rancagua, Chile
23 Nov 196352.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
29 Dec 196352.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
20 Nov 199483.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rancagua, Chile

MicroData Summary for Raul Silva Silva:
Bishop Raul Silva Silva (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rancagua

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013