Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Miguel Bastres Florence, S.D.B.

Bishop of Punta Arenas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1955 BornSantiago de Chile
14 Apr 197419.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jul 198227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Mar 200651.0AppointedBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
22 Apr 200651.2Ordained BishopBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Miguel Bastres Florence:
Bishop Bernardo Miguel Bastres Florence S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Punta Arenas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Punta Arenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013