Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Ricardo Lorenzelli Rossi, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Sesta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1953 Born
8 Sep 197219.0EnteredMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Sep 197724.0Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Dec 197926.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jan 198127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 May 201965.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 May 201965.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
22 Jun 201965.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta

MicroData Summary for Alberto Ricardo Lorenzelli Rossi
Bishop Alberto Ricardo Lorenzelli Rossi S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsidro Casanova, Argentina
Ordained DeaconSampierdarena, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained PriestSampierdarena, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2019
  • od/ob/c12: CB, 22 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 22 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Jun 2019

Quantcast