Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal Oviedo Cavada, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1927Born
28 Jan 194417.0EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Mar 194518.1Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
19 Mar 194821.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
24 Sep 194922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
21 Mar 196437.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
21 Mar 196437.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Beneventum
7 Jun 196437.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beneventum
25 Mar 197447.1AppointedArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
14 Apr 197447.2InstalledArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
4 May 197447.2AppointedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
2 Jun 197447.3InstalledAdministrator of Calama, Chile
3 Apr 197649.2ResignedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
30 Mar 199063.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Apr 199063.2InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
26 Nov 199467.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199467.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
16 Feb 199871.0ResignedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
7 Dec 199871.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Oviedo Cavada (VIAF: 54191863)
Carlos Cardinal Oviedo Cavada O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • prof/sole/c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017