Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Pérez de Espinosa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558²BornCastilla la Vieja, Spain
10 Aug 157517.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 May 160042.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
25 Jul 160042.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 162264.4ResignedBishop of Santiago de Chile
31 Oct 162264.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pérez de Espinosa:
Bishop Juan Pérez de Espinosa O.F.M. (born 1558, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,373
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,960
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 114, Number 726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015