Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Miguel Aristegui Arostegui

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1802Born
17 Apr 182523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
25 Jun 186967.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
25 Jun 186967.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
30 Aug 186967.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
16 Jun 187674.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Aristegui Arostegui (VIAF: 217145857882023020678)
Bishop José Miguel Aristegui Arostegui (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 23
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast