Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Ariztía Ruiz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Copiapó, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1925Born
22 Sep 195126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
25 May 196741.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
25 May 196741.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
9 Jul 196742.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici
11 Dec 197651.5AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
26 May 200175.9RetiredBishop of Copiapó, Chile
25 Nov 200378.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Copiapó, Chile

MicroData Summary for Fernando Ariztía Ruiz
Bishop Fernando Ariztía Ruiz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Copiapó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017