Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Felipe Bacarreza Rodríguez

Bishop of Santa Maria de Los Angeles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1948 BornSantiago de Chile
17 Apr 197728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
16 Jul 199143.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
16 Jul 199143.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepeta
8 Sep 199143.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepeta
7 Jan 200657.6AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile

MicroData Summary for Pedro Felipe Bacarreza Rodríguez:
Bishop Pedro Felipe Bacarreza Rodríguez (born ) Bishop of Santa Maria de Los Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Maria de Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013