Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Sucre

Archidioecesis Sucrensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 11 November 1924
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 49,975 (19,302 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdesucre.org.bo/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Casilla 205, Calle Bolivar 702, Sucre, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (04)6451.587
  • Fax: 6460.336

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of La Plata o Charcas
27 June 1552ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of La Plata o Charcas (erected)
27 June 1561Territory LostDiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Santiago de Chile (erected)
4 July 1605Territory LostDiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of La Paz (erected)
5 July 1605Territory LostDiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra (erected)
Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
20 July 1609ElevatedDiocese of La Plata o Charcas Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
11 November 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of Oruro (erected)
11 November 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of Potosí (erected)
11 November 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of Tarija (erected)
Archdiocese of Sucre
11 November 1924Name ChangedArchdiocese of La Plata o Charcas Archdiocese of Sucre

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
1910805,299.0%17299271026159135ce
Archdiocese of Sucre
1950370,000390,00094.9%3531665,6065811134ap1951
1966398,000400,00099.5%5131824,8534410841ap1967
1970380,000400,00095.0%3931705,4284540ap1971
1976510,000540,00094.4%3730677,6114211642ap1977
1980471,800476,00099.1%3530657,25814618043ap1981
1990481,000501,00096.0%4425696,9713518543ap1991
1999447,892479,89293.3%3127587,7224122843ap2000
2000480,379512,37993.8%4225677,1693724544ap2001
2001493,875522,43194.5%5123746,6733524744ap2002
2002481,807531,52290.6%5723806,0223424444ap2003
2003486,012546,13089.0%6323865,65113324644ap2004
2004473,967552,61985.8%5924835,71013925744ap2005
2010542,000618,00087.7%6724915,95614620545ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014