Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Miguel Argandoña Pastene Salazar

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1693BornCórdoba
11 Feb 171723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 Dec 174451.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Mar 174551.8ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
28 Aug 174653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
21 Jan 174854.6InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 Jan 176268.6AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
25 Oct 176370.4InstalledArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
11 Aug 177582.2DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Miguel Argandoña Pastene Salazar:
Archbishop Pedro Miguel Argandoña Pastene Salazar (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 341, and Page 420
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013