Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Francisco Cardinal Fresno Larraín

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1914Born
18 Dec 193723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Jun 195843.8AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
15 Aug 195844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Copiapó, Chile
26 Aug 195844.0InstalledBishop of Copiapó, Chile
28 Jun 196752.9AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
28 Sep 196753.1InstalledArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
3 May 198368.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
10 Jun 198368.8InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
25 May 198570.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198570.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea
30 Mar 199075.6RetiredArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
14 Oct 200490.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Fresno Larraín (VIAF: 3555500)
Juan Francisco Cardinal Fresno Larraín (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestCathedral, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSantos Angeles Custodios, Church, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
  • a cardinal for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ab/lase: CB, 15 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017