Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vicente Gabriel Tocornal Velasco

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1823Born
6 Jan 184622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 Mar 185330.1AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
9 Jun 185633.4ResignedBishop-Elect of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
11 Nov 185734.8DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Vicente Gabriel Tocornal Velasco
Father Vicente Gabriel Tocornal Velasco (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of San Carlos de Ancud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago

  • a priest for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast