Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio Gómez de Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹BornSantiago
1677¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 172671.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
28 Mar 172772.2SelectedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
20 Sep 172873.7ConfirmedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
1729²74.0Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
29 Sep 1731³76.7DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Gómez de Silva
Bishop Manuel Antonio Gómez de Silva (born 1655, died ) Bishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 145, and Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016