Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Antonio Elizondo y Prado

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1779BornSan Martin en la Concha
20 Mar 180223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 Apr 184061.2AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Feb 184162.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
2 Apr 184162.1InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
5 Oct 185273.6DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Diego Antonio Elizondo y Prado:
Bishop Diego Antonio Elizondo y Prado (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013