Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Francisco Quintana Jorquera, C.M.F.

Bishop Emeritus of Copiapó, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1936 Born
22 Mar 196427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 May 200164.6AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
1 Jul 200164.7Ordained BishopBishop of Copiapó, Chile
25 Jul 201477.8RetiredBishop of Copiapó, Chile

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Francisco Quintana Jorquera
Bishop Gaspar Francisco Quintana Jorquera C.M.F. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Copiapó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Copiapó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,999
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast