Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Valech Aldunate

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Zabi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1927BornSantiago de Chile
28 Jun 195325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 Aug 197345.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
27 Aug 197345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
18 Oct 197346.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabi
3 Mar 200375.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
24 Nov 201083.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Sergio Valech Aldunate:
Bishop Sergio Valech Aldunate (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 26 Nov 2014